VT S0120 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 2 2018 - 75% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 2 2018 - 75% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the persons authorized to make contributions to candidates and political parties
Title
An act relating to the persons authorized to make contributions to candidates and political parties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Pollina, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 23, Nays = 7 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment agreed to |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Cummings, Kitchel, and Sirotkin moved to amend bill |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-02-28 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Pollina, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 23, Nays = 7 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator White for Committee on Government Operations |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2018-02-28 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onGovernment Operations |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |