VT S0120 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 2 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to the persons authorized to make contributions to candidates and political parties

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to the persons authorized to make contributions to candidates and political parties

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-02SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2018-03-13HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations
2018-03-02SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2018-03-02SenateRecommendation of amendment agreed to
2018-03-02SenatePending third reading, Senator(s) Cummings, Kitchel, and Sirotkin moved to amend bill
2018-03-02SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2018-03-01SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2018-02-28Senate3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Pollina, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 23, Nays = 7
2018-02-28SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to
2018-02-28SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator White for Committee on Government Operations
2018-02-28SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
2018-02-28SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2018-02-27SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onGovernment Operations
2018-02-27SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2017-03-15SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback