VT S0117 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to the therapeutic use of cannabis

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to the therapeutic use of cannabis

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
2019-03-26SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-26SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2019-03-22SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
2019-03-22SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-22SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-03-19SenateReferred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31
2019-03-19SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-19SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-02-21SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback