VT S0111 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 7 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - Delivered to Governor on May 21, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to privatization contracts

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to privatization contracts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-21SenateDelivered to Governor on May 21, 2018
2018-05-08HouseSenate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in
2018-05-07SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2018-05-07SenateHouse proposal of amendment concurred in
2018-05-07SenateConsideration resumed
2018-05-07SenateConsideration postponed Shall the Senate concur with the House Proposal of Amendment?
2018-05-05SenateConsideration postponed Shall the Senate concur in the House Proposal of Amendment?
2018-05-04SenateConsideration postponed to next legislative day on motion of Senator Benning
2018-05-04SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2018-05-04SenateNew Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2018-05-03SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2018-05-03SenateHouse Proposal of Amendment
2018-05-03SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-05-02HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
2018-05-02HouseRead Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
2018-05-01HouseThird Reading Ordered
2018-05-01HouseReport of Committee on Government Operations agreed to.
2018-05-01HouseRep. Gannon of Wilmington reported for the committee on Government Operations
2018-05-01HouseRead Second Time
2018-05-01HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
2018-03-21HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations
2018-03-16SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2018-03-16SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2018-03-15Senate3rd reading ordered
2018-03-15SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to
2018-03-15SenateReported favorably by Senator Kitchel for Committee on Appropriations
2018-03-15SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Pearson for Committee on Government Operations
2018-03-15SenateReported without recommendation by Committee on Finance
2018-03-15SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
2018-03-15SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2018-03-14SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2018-03-14SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onGovernment Operations
2018-03-14SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-03-13SenateReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
2018-03-13SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onGovernment Operations
2018-03-13SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2017-03-02SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback