VT S0110 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Senate Message, signed by Governor March 17, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Senate Message, signed by Governor March 17, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to extending eligibility for Pandemic Emergency Unemployment Compensation
Title
An act relating to extending eligibility for Pandemic Emergency Unemployment Compensation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | House | Senate Message, signed by Governor March 17, 2021 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor on March 17, 2021 |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on March 12, 2021 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2021-03-11 | Senate | House message: House passed bill in concurrence |
2021-03-11 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2021-03-11 | House | Read Third time and passed in concurrence |
2021-03-11 | House | Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2021-03-11 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2021-03-11 | House | Read Second time |
2021-03-11 | House | Rules suspended and taken up for immediate consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2021-03-11 | House | Read First Time |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Balint |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Sirotkin for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Balint |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Rule 31 suspended & bill not referred to Appropriations |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Rules suspended on motion of Senator Balint |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |