VT S0108 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Signed by Governor on February 20, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to employee misclassification

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to employee misclassification

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20SenateSigned by Governor on February 20, 2020
2020-02-14SenateDelivered to Governor on February 14, 2020
2020-02-11HouseSenate message, report of committee of conference adopted
2020-02-07SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2020-02-07SenateCommittee of Conference report adopted
2020-02-07SenateCommittee of Conference report submitted by Senator Sirotkin for Committee, text
2020-02-07SenateNew Business/Committee of Conference Report
2020-02-06SenateHouse message House adopted Conference Committee report
2020-02-06SenateCommittee of Conference Report
2020-02-06SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-02-04HouseCommittee of Conference report adopted (Senate bill)
2019-05-16HouseSpeaker appointed Hill of Wolcott, Kornheiser of Brattleboro and Marcotte of Coventry as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House
2019-05-16HouseSenate Message, House proposal of amendment not concurred in and committee of conference appointed
2019-05-16SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2019-05-16SenateCommittee of Conference appointed: Senators Sirotkin, Clarkson, and Hooker
2019-05-16SenateHouse proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator Sirotkin
2019-05-16SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2019-05-16SenateUnfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2019-05-15SenateNew Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2019-05-14SenateHouse Proposal of Amendment
2019-05-14SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-05-13SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2019-05-13HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2019-05-13HouseRead Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
2019-05-10HouseThird Reading Ordered
2019-05-10HouseReport of Committee on Commerce and Economic Development agreed to.
2019-05-10HouseRep. Hooper of Montpelier recommended for the committee on Appropriations
2019-05-10HouseRep. Kornheiser of Brattleboro reported for the committee on Commerce and Economic Development
2019-05-10HouseRead Second Time
2019-05-10HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2019-05-10HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
2019-03-22HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development
2019-03-20SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2019-03-20SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2019-03-19Senate3rd reading ordered
2019-03-19SenateRoll Call, requested by Senator Sirotkin,  Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0
2019-03-19SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs agreed to
2019-03-19SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Sirotkin for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2019-03-19SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2019-03-19SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2019-03-15SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-03-15SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2019-02-19SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback