VT S0101 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Signed by Governor on May 30, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to the conduct of forestry operations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to the conduct of forestry operations

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-30SenateSigned by Governor on May 30, 2018
2018-05-24SenateDelivered to Governor on May 24, 2018
2018-05-03SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2018-05-03SenateHouse message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment
2018-05-01HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
2018-04-26HouseSenate message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto
2018-04-25SenateProposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment agreed to
2018-04-25SenateSenator Branagan moved to concur in House proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment; text
2018-04-25SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2018-04-25SenateUnfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2018-04-24SenateUnfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2018-04-20SenateUnfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2018-04-19SenateNew Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2018-04-18SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2018-04-18SenateHouse Proposal of Amendment
2018-04-18SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-04-13HousePassed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2018-04-13HouseRead Third time
2018-04-12HouseThird Reading Ordered
2018-04-12HouseReport of Committee on Agriculture and Forestry agreed to.
2018-04-12HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 66 of 131 to Pass -- Yeas = 127, Nays = 4
2018-04-12HouseRep. Higley of Lowell reported for the committee on Agriculture and Forestry
2018-04-12HouseRead Second Time
2018-01-26HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry
2018-01-24SenateRead 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator MacDonald, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0
2018-01-24SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2018-01-23Senate3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Westman, Passed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 1
2018-01-23SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture, as amended, agreed to
2018-01-23SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture amended as moved by Senator Branagan, Sirotkin, and Starr
2018-01-23SenateRecommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Branagan, Sirotkin, and Starr
2018-01-23SenatePending question:  Shall bill be amended as recommended by Committee on Agriculture?
2018-01-23SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2018-01-19SenateRecommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Bray and Starr
2018-01-19SenatePending question:  Shall bill be amended as recommended by Committee on Agriculture?
2018-01-19SenateConsideration postponed to January 19, 2018
2018-01-18SenateConsideration postponed to next legislative day on motion of Senator Baruth
2018-01-18SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Branagan for Committee on Agriculture
2018-01-18SenateSenator MacDonald requested & granted leave to withdraw motion
2018-01-18SenateSenator MacDonald moved to suspend rules to have the President of the Senate commit the bill to the committee of jurisdiction with the report of Agriculture intact
2018-01-18SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture
2018-01-18SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2018-01-17SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture
2018-01-17SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2018-01-16SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onAgriculture
2018-01-16SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2017-06-21SenateCommittee on Judiciary relieved; bill committed to Committee on Agriculture on motion of Senator Sears
2017-02-28SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback