VT S0099 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Senate Message, signed by Governor May 12, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Senate Message, signed by Governor May 12, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to repealing the statute of limitations for civil actions based on childhood physical abuse
Title
An act relating to repealing the statute of limitations for civil actions based on childhood physical abuse
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Pearson [D] | Sen. Kesha Ram Hinsdale [D] | Sen. Philip Baruth [D] | Sen. Randolph Brock [R] |
Sen. Thomas Chittenden [D] | Sen. Virginia Lyons [D] | Sen. Michael Sirotkin [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | Senate Message, signed by Governor May 12, 2021 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 12, 2021 |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on May 7, 2021 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | House message: House passed bill in concurrence |
2021-04-30 | House | Read Third time and passed in concurrence |
2021-04-29 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2021-04-29 | House | Rep. Leffler of Enosburgh reported for the Committee on Judiciary |
2021-04-29 | House | Read Second time |
2021-04-23 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2021-04-21 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2021-04-20 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 0 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Baruth for Committee on Judiciary |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2021-04-20 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules per Temporary Senate Rule 44A |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |