VT S0096 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - New Business/House Proposal of Amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to a news media privilege

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to a news media privilege

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10SenateNew Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2017-05-18HouseSenate Message, Signed by Governor May 17, 2017
2017-05-17SenateSigned by Governor on 5/17/2017
2017-05-11SenateDelivered to Governor on 5/11/17
2017-04-21SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2017-04-21SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence
2017-04-20HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 140, Nays = 2
2017-04-20HouseRead Third time and Passed in Concurrence
2017-04-19HouseThird Reading Ordered
2017-04-19HouseRep. Lalonde of South Burlington reported for the committee on Judiciary
2017-04-19HouseRead Second Time
2017-03-28HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary
2017-03-23SenateRead 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Collamore, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 0
2017-03-23SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2017-03-22Senate3rd reading ordered
2017-03-22SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to
2017-03-22SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator White for Committee on Government Operations
2017-03-22SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
2017-03-22SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2017-03-21SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onGovernment Operations
2017-02-24SenateCommittee on Judiciary relieved; bill committed to Committee on Government Operations on motion of Senator Sears
2017-02-24SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback