VT S0096 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - New Business/House Proposal of Amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - New Business/House Proposal of Amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to a news media privilege
Title
An act relating to a news media privilege
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-20 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 140, Nays = 2 (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Collamore, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Collamore, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2017-05-18 | House | Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 17, 2017 |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 5/17/2017 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on 5/11/17 |
2017-04-21 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2017-04-21 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence |
2017-04-20 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 140, Nays = 2 |
2017-04-20 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence |
2017-04-19 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2017-04-19 | House | Rep. Lalonde of South Burlington reported for the committee on Judiciary |
2017-04-19 | House | Read Second Time |
2017-03-28 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Collamore, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 0 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2017-03-22 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator White for Committee on Government Operations |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2017-03-22 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onGovernment Operations |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Committee on Judiciary relieved; bill committed to Committee on Government Operations on motion of Senator Sears |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |