VT S0088 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Senate Message, signed by Governor May 12, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Senate Message, signed by Governor May 12, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to insurance, banking, and securities
Title
An act relating to insurance, banking, and securities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | Senate Message, signed by Governor May 12, 2021 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 12, 2021 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on May 6, 2021 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2021-05-04 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment |
2021-04-30 | House | Senate proposal of amendment to the House proposal of amendment agreed to |
2021-04-28 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment agreed to |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Senator Hardy, Bray, Brock, Cummings, MacDonald, and Pearson moved to concur in House proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment; text |
2021-04-27 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2021-04-21 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2021-04-20 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2021-04-16 | Senate | House message: House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2021-04-16 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2021-04-16 | House | Read Third time and passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2021-04-16 | House | Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2021-04-16 | House | Report of Committee on Commerce and Economic Development as amended agreed to |
2021-04-16 | House | Amendment as offered by Rep. Donahue of Northfield, Black of Essex, Burrows of West Windsor, Cordes of Lincoln, Goldman of Rockingham, Houghton of Essex, Lippert of Hinesburg, Page of Newport City, and Peterson of Clarendon agreed to |
2021-04-16 | House | Amendment as offered by Rep. Marcotte of Coventry, Kimbell of Woodstock, Jerome of Brandon, Nicoll of Ludlow, Nigro of Bennington, Seymour of Sutton, and White of Bethel agreed to |
2021-04-16 | House | Rep. Till of Jericho recommended for the Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-04-16 | House | Rep. Nicoll of Ludlow reported for the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development |
2021-04-16 | House | Read Second time |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2021-03-25 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2021-03-23 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2021-03-19 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Hardy for Committee on Finance |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2021-03-17 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |