VT S0088 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - 3rd reading refused on roll call, requested by Senator Starr, Failed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 13, Nays = 16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to increasing the smoking age from 18 to 21 years of age

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to increasing the smoking age from 18 to 21 years of age

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-25Senate3rd reading refused on roll call, requested by Senator Starr, Failed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 13, Nays = 16
2017-04-25SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare, as amended, agreed to
2017-04-25SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare amended as moved by Senator Ingram
2017-04-25SenateRecommendation of amendment by Senator(s) Ingram, text
2017-04-25SenateSenator Ingram requested & granted leave to withdraw amendment
2017-04-25SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2017-04-25SenateCalled Up
2017-04-24SenatePending Question: Shall the recommendation of amendment of the Committee on Health and Welfare be amended as moved by Sen. Ingram?
2017-04-24SenateCalled Up
2017-04-21SenateCalled up by Senator Ayer
2017-03-24SenateOrdered to lie on motion of Senator Ayer
2017-03-24SenateConsideration resumed
2017-03-24SenateConsideration interrupted by recess
2017-03-24SenateRoll Call, requested by Senator Sears,  Failed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 14, Nays = 15
2017-03-24SenateMotion disagreed to
2017-03-24SenateSenator Degree motion to commit bill to Committee on Finance
2017-03-24SenateMotion by Senator Rodgers to reconsider previous vote whereby the bill was committed to Finance agreed to
2017-03-23SenateRoll Call, requested by Senator Baruth,  Passed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 15, Nays = 13
2017-03-23SenateCommitted to Committee on Finance on motion of Senator Degree
2017-03-23SenateSenator Mazza requested & granted leave to abstain from voting pursuant to Senate Rules 69 & 71
2017-03-23SenateSenatorIngram moved to amend
2017-03-23SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Ingram for Committee on Health and Welfare
2017-03-23SenateRecommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Ingram
2017-03-23SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
2017-03-23SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2017-03-22SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
2017-03-22SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2017-03-21SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onHealth and Welfare
2017-02-21SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback