VT S0087 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Rep. Grad of Moretown moved that the committee on Judiciary be relieved of the bill and that the same be committed to the committee on Education which was agreed to.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to sexual exploitation of students

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to sexual exploitation of students

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-23HouseRep. Grad of Moretown moved that the committee on Judiciary be relieved of the bill and that the same be committed to the committee on Education which was agreed to.
2017-03-02HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary
2017-02-28SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2017-02-28SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2017-02-24Senate3rd reading ordered
2017-02-24SenateRecommendation of amendment agreed to
2017-02-24SenateRecommendation of amendment by Senator(s) Benning, text
2017-02-24SenateRead 2nd time
2017-02-24SenateRecommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears
2017-02-24SenateUnfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading
2017-02-23SenateRecommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears
2017-02-23SenateUnfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading
2017-02-22SenateRecommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator Sears
2017-02-22SenateUnfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading
2017-02-21SenateRecommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears
2017-02-21SenateNew Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading
2017-02-17SenateCommittee Bill for Second Reading
2017-02-16SenateCommittee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback