VT S0086 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 16, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 16, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to increasing the legal age for buying and using cigarettes, electronic cigarettes, and other tobacco products from 18 to 21 years of age
Title
An act relating to increasing the legal age for buying and using cigarettes, electronic cigarettes, and other tobacco products from 18 to 21 years of age
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 72 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 33, Nays = 109 (Y: 33 N: 109 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-04-23 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 138 to Pass -- Yeas = 124, Nays = 14 (Y: 124 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 138 to Pass -- Yeas = 124, Nays = 14 (Y: 124 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 16, 2017 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 16, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on May 14, 2019 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2019-04-30 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2019-04-30 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2019-04-30 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-04-26 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-04-25 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2019-04-24 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2019-04-24 | House | Which was disagreed to |
2019-04-24 | House | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 72 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 33, Nays = 109 |
2019-04-24 | House | Rep. Helm of Fair Haven moved to amend the House proposal of amendment. |
2019-04-24 | House | Rep. Cina of Burlington asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment |
2019-04-24 | House | Rep. Cina of Burlington moved to amend the House proposal of amendment. |
2019-04-23 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-04-23 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 138 to Pass -- Yeas = 124, Nays = 14 |
2019-04-23 | House | Recommendation of Amendment of the Committee on Human Services agreed to |
2019-04-23 | House | Rep. Till of Jericho recommended for the committee on Ways and Means |
2019-04-23 | House | Rep. Brumsted of Shelburne reported for the committee on Human Services |
2019-04-23 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-04-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2019-03-13 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Human Services |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2019-03-01 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Campion for Committee on Finance |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Ingram for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-02-28 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |