VT S0084 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to emissions inspections

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to emissions inspections

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Transportation
2019-02-21SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2019-02-21SenateMotion disagreed to
2019-02-21SenatePending third reading, motion to amend bill offered by Senator(s) Bray
2019-02-21SenateRecommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Bray
2019-02-21SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2019-02-20SenateRecommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Bray
2019-02-20SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2019-02-19SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2019-02-15SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2019-02-14SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2019-02-13SenateUnfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading
2019-02-12SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2019-02-08Senate3rd reading ordered
2019-02-08SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-08SenateNew Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading
2019-02-07SenateCommittee Bill for Second Reading
2019-02-07SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-02-06SenateCommittee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback