VT S0079 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Signed by Governor on March 28, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to freedom from compulsory collection of personal information

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to freedom from compulsory collection of personal information

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-28SenateSigned by Governor on March 28, 2017
2017-03-24SenateDelivered to Governor on March 24, 2017
2017-03-16SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2017-03-16SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence
2017-03-15HouseRead Third time and Passed in Concurrence
2017-03-14HouseThird Reading Ordered
2017-03-14HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 68 of 134 to Pass -- Yeas = 110, Nays = 24
2017-03-14HouseRep. Conquest of Newbury recommended for the committee on Judiciary
2017-03-14HouseRead Second Time
2017-02-28HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary
2017-02-24SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Sears
2017-02-24SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2017-02-24SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2017-02-23Senate3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0
2017-02-23SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to
2017-02-23SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary
2017-02-23SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2017-02-23SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2017-02-22SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2017-02-22SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2017-02-21SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary
2017-02-09SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback