VT S0078 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-09 - Signed by Governor on February 8, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to binding interest arbitration for employees of the Vermont Judiciary

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to binding interest arbitration for employees of the Vermont Judiciary

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-09SenateSigned by Governor on February 8, 2022
2022-02-02SenateDelivered to Governor on February 2, 2022
2022-02-01HouseSenate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in
2022-01-28SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2022-01-28SenateHouse proposal of amendment concurred in
2022-01-28SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2022-01-28SenateUnfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2022-01-27SenateNew Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2022-01-26SenateHouse Proposal of Amendment
2022-01-26SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2022-01-25SenateHouse message: House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2022-01-21HouseRead Third time and passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2022-01-21HouseAction Calendar: Third reading
2022-01-20HouseThird Reading ordered
2022-01-20HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Walz of Barre City agreed to
2022-01-20HouseRep. Walz of Barre City reported for the Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs
2022-01-20HouseRead Second time
2022-01-20HouseAction Calendar: Amendment offered by Rep Walz of Barre City
2022-01-20HouseAction Calendar: Favorable
2022-01-19HouseAction Calendar: Favorable
2022-01-18HouseAction Calendar: Favorable
2022-01-11HouseRep. Walz of Barre City moved to postpone action until January 20, 2022 which was agreed to
2022-01-11HouseAction Calendar:Unfinished Business
2022-01-07HouseAction Calendar:Unfinished Business
2021-06-23HouseAction postponed until January 5, 2022 as moved by Rep. Walz of Barre City
2021-05-21HouseAction postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Walz of Barre City
2021-03-18HouseRead First Time and referred to the Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs
2021-03-16SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2021-03-16SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2021-03-12SenateReported favorably by Senator Ram for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
2021-03-12SenateFavorable report by Committee on Government Operations
2021-03-12SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2021-03-11SenateFavorable report by Committee on Government Operations
2021-03-11SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2021-02-12SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback