VT S0075 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Signed by Governor on June 8, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Signed by Governor on June 8, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to aquatic nuisance species control
Title
An act relating to aquatic nuisance species control
Sponsors
Sen. John Rodgers [D] | Sen. Claire Ayer [D] | Sen. Rebecca Balint [D] | Rep. Carolyn Branagan [R] |
Sen. Christopher Bray [D] | Sen. Brian Campion [D] | Sen. Dustin Degree [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 139 to Pass -- Yeas = 137, Nays = 2 (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor on June 8, 2017 |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 6/8/17 |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on 6/2/17 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Rules suspended & action messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2017-05-05 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Committee of Conference report adopted |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Rodgers for Committee, text |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Rodgers |
2017-05-05 | Senate | House message House adopted Conference Committee report |
2017-05-04 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2017-05-04 | House | Committee of Conference report adopted (Senate bill) |
2017-04-28 | Senate | House message House appointed Conference Committee members |
2017-04-27 | House | Speaker appointed Sullivan of Burlington, Deen of Westminster and Squirrell of Underhill as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2017-04-27 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment not concurred in and committee of conference appointed |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Rodgers, Campion, and Bray |
2017-04-25 | Senate | House proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator Bray |
2017-04-25 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2017-04-25 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2017-04-24 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2017-04-21 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2017-04-20 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2017-04-20 | House | Which was agreed to |
2017-04-20 | House | Rep. Brennan of Colchester moved to amend the House proposal of amendment. |
2017-04-19 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2017-04-19 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 139 to Pass -- Yeas = 138, Nays = 1 |
2017-04-19 | House | Report of Committee on Natural Resources, Fish & Wildlife agreed to. |
2017-04-19 | House | Rep. Lefebvre of Newark reported for the committee on Natural Resources, Fish & Wildlife |
2017-04-19 | House | Read Second Time |
2017-03-28 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, Fish & Wildlife |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2017-03-23 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2017-03-22 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy agreed to |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Rodgers for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2017-03-22 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onNatural Resources and Energy |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |