VT S0074 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - Senate Message, signed by Governor April 27, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - Senate Message, signed by Governor April 27, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to modifications to Vermont’s patient choice at end of life laws
Title
An act relating to modifications to Vermont’s patient choice at end of life laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-13 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 70 of 139 to Pass -- Yeas = 41, Nays = 98 (Y: 41 N: 98 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | House | Senate Message, signed by Governor April 27, 2022 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor on April 27, 2022 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on April 21.2022 |
2022-04-15 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2022-04-15 | Senate | House message: House passed bill in concurrence |
2022-04-14 | House | Read Third time and passed in concurrence |
2022-04-14 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2022-04-13 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2022-04-13 | House | Which was disagreed to |
2022-04-13 | House | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 70 of 139 to Pass -- Yeas = 41, Nays = 98 |
2022-04-13 | House | Rep. Donahue of Northfield demanded yeas and nays |
2022-04-13 | House | Rep. Donahue of Northfield moved to amend the bill |
2022-04-13 | House | Rep. Pugh of South Burlington reported for the Committee on Human Services |
2022-04-13 | House | Read Second time |
2022-04-13 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable |
2022-04-12 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable |
2022-01-26 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Human Services |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2022-01-25 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2022-01-21 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment agreed to |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Hardy for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2022-01-21 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |