VT S0072 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Senate Message, signed by Governor May 3, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Senate Message, signed by Governor May 3, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the Interstate Compact on the Placement of Children
Title
An act relating to the Interstate Compact on the Placement of Children
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | House | Senate Message, signed by Governor May 3, 2022 |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 3, 2022 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on April 27, 2022 |
2022-04-20 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2022-04-19 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2022-04-19 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2022-04-19 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2022-04-15 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2022-04-14 | Senate | House message: House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2022-04-14 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-04-12 | House | Read Third time and passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2022-04-12 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2022-04-08 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2022-04-08 | House | Rep. Gregoire of Fairfield and Small of Winooski moved to amend the bill which was agreed to |
2022-04-08 | House | Rep. Jessup of Middlesex recommended for the Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-08 | House | Rep. Gregoire of Fairfield reported for the Committee on Human Services |
2022-04-08 | House | Read Second time |
2022-04-08 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable |
2022-04-07 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable |
2022-04-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2022-04-05 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable |
2022-03-25 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Human Services |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2022-03-23 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2022-03-22 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Sears for Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Lyons for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2022-03-17 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |