VT S0007 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Senate Message, signed by Governor June 7, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to expanding access to expungement and sealing of criminal history records

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to expanding access to expungement and sealing of criminal history records

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-21HouseSenate Message, signed by Governor June 7, 2021
2021-05-21SenateSigned by Governor on June 7, 2021
2021-05-21SenateDelivered to Governor on June 1, 2021
2021-05-20HouseSenate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in
2021-05-20SenateRules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint
2021-05-20SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2021-05-20SenateHouse proposal of amendment concurred in
2021-05-20SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2021-05-20SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Balint
2021-05-19SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2021-05-20SenateHouse Proposal of Amendment
2021-05-20SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2021-05-19HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2021-05-19HouseRead Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
2021-05-18HouseThird Reading Ordered
2021-05-18HouseReport of Committee on Judiciary agreed to
2021-05-18HouseRep. Colburn of Burlington reported for the Committee on Judiciary
2021-05-18HouseRead Second Time
2021-03-18HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary
2021-03-16SenateRead 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0
2021-03-16SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2021-03-12Senate3rd reading ordered
2021-03-12SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to
2021-03-12SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Benning for Committee on Judiciary
2021-03-12SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2021-03-12SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2021-03-11SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2021-03-11SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2021-01-12SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback