VT S0061 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-13 - Signed by Governor on June 13, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to offenders with mental illness, inmate records, and inmate services

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to offenders with mental illness, inmate records, and inmate services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-13SenateSigned by Governor on June 13, 2017
2017-06-13SenateSigned by Governor on 6/13/17
2017-06-07SenateDelivered to Governor on 6/7/17
2017-05-08SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2017-05-08SenateHouse message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment
2017-05-04HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment to the House Proposal of Amendment agreed to
2017-05-04HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment considered
2017-05-04HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
2017-05-03SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2017-05-03SenateProposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment agreed to
2017-05-03SenateProposal of amendment by Senator(s) Sears; text
2017-05-03SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2017-05-03SenateNew Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2017-05-02SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2017-05-02SenateHouse Proposal of Amendment
2017-05-01HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
2017-05-01HouseRead Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
2017-04-28HouseThird Reading Ordered
2017-04-28HouseReport of Committee on Corrections and Institutions agreed to.
2017-04-28HouseRep. Taylor of Colchester reported for the committee on Corrections and Institutions
2017-04-28HouseRead Second Time
2017-03-24HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Corrections and Institutions
2017-03-22SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2017-03-22SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2017-03-21Senate3rd reading ordered
2017-03-21SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to
2017-03-21SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator White for Committee on Judiciary
2017-03-21SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2017-03-21SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2017-03-17SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2017-03-17SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2017-03-16SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary
2017-02-01SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback