VT S0060 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-11 - Read first time and referred to the Committee on Government Operations and Military Affairs
Pending: House Government Operations and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-11 - Read first time and referred to the Committee on Government Operations and Military Affairs
Pending: House Government Operations and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to local option taxes
Title
An act relating to local option taxes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-11 | House | Read first time and referred to the Committee on Government Operations and Military Affairs |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2023-04-05 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2023-04-04 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance, as amended, agreed to |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance amended as moved by Senator Brock, Bray, Chittenden, Cummings, MacDonald, and McCormack |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Consideration resumed |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Hardy |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Consideration postponed Pending Question: Amend as recommended by Committee on Finance? |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Consideration postponed Pending question: Amend as recommended by Committee on Finance? |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Consideration postponed Pending Question: Amend as recommend by the Committee on Finance? |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Consideration postponed Pending Question: Amend as recommended by Committee on Finance? |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Consideration postponed to March 29, 2023 on motion of Senator Hardy |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Brock for Committee on Finance |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2023-03-21 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |