VT S0060 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Senate Message, signed by Governor April 26, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Senate Message, signed by Governor April 26, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to allowing municipal and cooperative utilities to offer innovative rates and services
Title
An act relating to allowing municipal and cooperative utilities to offer innovative rates and services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | House | Senate Message, signed by Governor April 26, 2021 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor on April 26, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on April 20, 2021 |
2021-04-16 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2021-04-16 | Senate | House message: House passed bill in concurrence |
2021-04-14 | House | Read Third time and passed in concurrence |
2021-04-13 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2021-04-13 | House | Rep. Patt of Worcester reported for the Committee on Energy and Technology |
2021-04-13 | House | Read Second time |
2021-04-07 | House | Rep. Sibilia of Dover moved to postpone action until April 13, 2021 which was agreed to |
2021-03-26 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Energy and Technology |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment agreed to |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend bill offered by Senator(s) Perchlik |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Perchlik |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2021-03-23 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2021-03-19 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Bray for Committee on Finance |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2021-03-17 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |