VT S0054 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 21 2009 - 75% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-22 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 21 2009 - 75% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-22 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Clean Energy Assessment Districts
Title
An Act Relating To Clean Energy Assessment Districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Energy | |
2009-04-21 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin | |
2009-04-21 | As passed by Senate | |
2009-04-21 | Passed on roll call, requested by Senator Snelling, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 28, Nays = 2 | |
2009-04-21 | Recommendation of amendment by Senator Cummings after third reading agreed to | |
2009-04-21 | Senator(s) Cummings requested & granted leave to offer amendment after third reading | |
2009-04-21 | Consideration resumed | |
2009-04-21 | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator Cummings after third reading | |
2009-04-21 | Consideration postponed; pending question: Shall bill pass? | |
2009-04-17 | Consideration postponed to next legislative day | |
2009-04-17 | Consideration postponed; pending question: Shall bill pass? | |
2009-04-15 | Consideration postponed to next legislative day on motion of Senator Shumlin | |
2009-04-15 | Senator Doyle requested & granted leave to withdraw motion | |
2009-04-15 | Senator Doyle motion to order bill to lie on the table | |
2009-04-15 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-15 | Recommendation of amendment agreed to on roll call, requested by Senator Snelling, Passed -- Needed 14 of 27 to Pass -- Yeas = 17, Nays = 10 | |
2009-04-15 | Senator Cummings requested & granted leave to withdraw motion | |
2009-04-15 | Senator Cummings motion to order bill to lie on the table | |
2009-04-15 | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Illuzzi moved to amend bill | |
2009-04-15 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Shumlin | |
2009-04-15 | Called up by Senator Shumlin & placed on action calendar for April 17, 2009 | |
2009-04-03 | Ordered to lie on motion of Senator Snelling on division 16-13 | |
2009-04-03 | Floor amendment # 3 disagreed to | |
2009-04-03 | Floor amendment # 1,2 agreed to | |
2009-04-03 | Question divided on demand of Senator Illuzzi | |
2009-04-03 | Consideration resumed | |
2009-04-03 | Consideration interrupted by Special Order | |
2009-04-03 | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Illuzzi moved to amend bill | |
2009-04-03 | Unfinished Business/Third Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Consideration postponed to next legislative day | |
2009-04-02 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2009-04-01 | 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Campbell, Passed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 25, Nays = 3 | |
2009-04-01 | Recommendation of Committee on Finance, as amended, agreed to | |
2009-04-01 | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance amended as moved by SenatorCummings | |
2009-04-01 | Senator Lyons requested & granted leave to withdraw Natural Resources and Energy Committee recommendation of amendment | |
2009-04-01 | Reported favorably by Senator Cummings for Committee on Finance with recommendation of amendment | |
2009-04-01 | Reported favorably by Senator Hartwell for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy with recommendation of amendment | |
2009-04-01 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-02 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance | |
2009-04-01 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy | |
2009-04-01 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2009-03-31 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onFinance | |
2009-03-31 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onNatural Resources and Energy | |
2009-03-31 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-24 | Rules suspended & bill committed to Committee on Finance with the report of Committee on Natural Resources and Energy intact, on motion of Senator Shumlin | |
2009-03-24 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy | |
2009-03-24 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2009-03-23 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Shumlin | |
2009-03-23 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onNatural Resources and Energy | |
2009-02-03 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |