VT S0053 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to recommendations for achieving universal coverage for primary care in Vermont

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to recommendations for achieving universal coverage for primary care in Vermont

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
2018-04-04HouseRep. Turner of Milton moved that the committee on Rules be relieved of the bill and that the same be committed to the committee on Health Care which was agreed to.
2018-03-27HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Rules
2018-03-22SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2018-03-22SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2018-03-21Senate3rd reading ordered
2018-03-21SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare, as amended, agreed to
2018-03-21SenateRoll Call, requested by Senator Brock,  Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 24, Nays = 6
2018-03-21SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations
2018-03-21SenateReported favorably by Senator Kitchel for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment
2018-03-21SenateReported without recommendation by Senator Lyons for Committee on Finance
2018-03-21SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Ayer for Committee on Health and Welfare
2018-03-21SenateSubstitute Recommendation/Proposal of amendment, by Committee on Appropriations
2018-03-21SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2018-03-21SenateReported without recommendation by Committee on Finance
2018-03-21SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
2018-03-21SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2018-03-20SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onAppropriations
2018-03-20SenateReported without recommendation by Committee on Finance
2018-03-20SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onHealth and Welfare
2018-03-20SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-03-14SenateReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
2018-03-14SenateReported without recommendation by Committee on Finance
2018-03-14SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onHealth and Welfare
2018-03-14SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-03-02SenateRules suspended & bill committed to Committee on Finance with the report of Committee on Health and Welfare as if referred under Rule 31 intact, on motion of Senator Ayer
2017-01-27SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback