VT S0050 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-07 - Signed by Governor on June 7, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-07 - Signed by Governor on June 7, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to insurance coverage for telemedicine services delivered in or outside a health care facility
Title
An act relating to insurance coverage for telemedicine services delivered in or outside a health care facility
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-07 | Senate | Signed by Governor on June 7, 2017 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 6/7/17 |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on 6/1/17 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza |
2017-05-10 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Committee of Conference report adopted |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Ingram for Committee, text |
2017-05-10 | Senate | New Business/Committee of Conference Report |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Committee of Conference Report |
2017-05-05 | Senate | House message House adopted Conference Committee report |
2017-05-04 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton |
2017-05-04 | House | Committee of Conference report adopted (Senate bill) |
2017-05-04 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton |
2017-04-28 | Senate | House message House appointed Conference Committee members |
2017-04-27 | House | Speaker appointed Briglin of Thetford, Copeland-Hanzas of Bradford and Christensen of Weathersfield as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2017-04-27 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment not concurred in and committee of conference appointed |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Ayer, Lyons, and Ingram |
2017-04-25 | Senate | House proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator Ayer |
2017-04-25 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2017-04-24 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2017-04-21 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2017-04-20 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2017-04-19 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2017-04-18 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2017-04-18 | House | Report of Committee on Health Care agreed to. |
2017-04-18 | House | Rep. Christensen of Weathersfield reported for the committee on Health Care |
2017-04-18 | House | Read Second Time |
2017-03-01 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Health Care |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2017-02-24 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2017-02-23 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Lyons for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2017-02-22 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onHealth and Welfare |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Committee on Finance relieved; bill committed to Committee on Health and Welfare on motion of Senator Cummings |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |