VT S0048 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Senate Message, signed by Governor June 7, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to Vermont’s adoption of the interstate Nurse Licensure Compact

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to Vermont’s adoption of the interstate Nurse Licensure Compact

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-21HouseSenate Message, signed by Governor June 7, 2021
2021-05-21SenateSigned by Governor on June 7, 2021
2021-05-21SenateDelivered to Governor on June 1, 2021
2021-05-20HouseSenate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in
2021-05-20SenateRules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint
2021-05-20SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2021-05-20SenateHouse proposal of amendment concurred in
2021-05-20SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2021-05-20SenateNew Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2021-05-19SenateHouse Proposal of Amendment
2021-05-19SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2021-05-18SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2021-05-18HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2021-05-18HouseRead Third time and passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2021-05-14HouseThird Reading ordered
2021-05-14HouseReport of Committee on Ways and Means agreed to
2021-05-14HouseReport of Committee on Government Operations agreed to
2021-05-14HouseRep. Townsend of South Burlington recommended for the Committee on Appropriations
2021-05-14HouseRep. Durfee of Shaftsbury spoke for the Committee on Ways and Means
2021-05-14HouseRep. Mrowicki of Putney reported for the Committee on Government Operations
2021-05-14HouseRead Second time
2021-05-07HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
2021-04-28HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
2021-03-31HouseRead First Time and referred to the Committee on Government Operations
2021-03-26SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2021-03-26SenatePending third reading, motion to amend bill disagreed to
2021-03-26SenateRecommendation of amendment by Senator(s) Terenzini, text
2021-03-26SenatePending third reading, Senator(s) Terenzini moved to amend bill
2021-03-26SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2021-03-25Senate3rd reading ordered
2021-03-25SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to
2021-03-25SenateReported favorably by Senator Starr for Committee on Appropriations
2021-03-25SenateReported favorably by Senator Hardy for Committee on Finance
2021-03-25SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Hardy for Committee on Health and Welfare
2021-03-25SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2021-03-25SenateFavorable report by Committee on Finance
2021-03-25SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
2021-03-25SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2021-03-24SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2021-03-24SenateFavorable report by Committee on Finance
2021-03-24SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
2021-03-24SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2021-03-23SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2021-03-23SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
2021-03-23SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2021-03-17SenateReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
2021-03-17SenateFavorable report by Committee on Finance
2021-03-17SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
2021-03-17SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2021-03-09SenateReferred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31
2021-03-09SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
2021-03-09SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2021-01-27SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare

Vermont State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/status/2022/S.48
Texthttps://legislature.vermont.gov/Documents/2022/Docs/BILLS/S-0048/S-0048%20As%20Introduced.pdf
Texthttps://legislature.vermont.gov/Documents/2022/Docs/BILLS/S-0048/S-0048%20As%20passed%20by%20the%20Senate%20Official.pdf
Texthttps://legislature.vermont.gov/Documents/2022/Docs/BILLS/S-0048/S-0048%20As%20Passed%20by%20Both%20House%20and%20Senate%20Official.pdf
Texthttps://legislature.vermont.gov/Documents/2022/Docs/ACTS/ACT064/ACT064%20As%20Enacted.pdf
Supplementhttps://ljfo.vermont.gov/assets/Publications/Senate-Bills/da41ebdb25/GENERAL-353883-v1-S_48_Nurse_Licencing_Compact.pdf
Supplementhttps://ljfo.vermont.gov/assets/Publications/Senate-Bills/7df8480b8a/SENATE-PASSED-v4-S_48_Nurse_Licencing_Compact.pdf
Supplementhttps://ljfo.vermont.gov/assets/Publications/Senate-Bills/3df39cf192/HWM-AMEND-v5-S_48_Nurse_Licencing_Compact.pdf
Supplementhttps://ljfo.vermont.gov/assets/Publications/Senate-Bills/7e8cd27543/HOUSE-PASSED-AMENDMENT-v6-S_48_Nurse_Licencing_Compact.pdf
Supplementhttps://ljfo.vermont.gov/assets/Publications/As-Passed-by-the-General-Assembly/ced288fc82/GENERAL-353883-v7-S_48_Nurse_Licencing_Compact.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback