VT S0045 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-02 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Health Care
Pending: House Health Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-02 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Health Care
Pending: House Health Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to providing meals to health care providers at conferences
Title
An act relating to providing meals to health care providers at conferences
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-02 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Health Care |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Pending third reading, bill amended as moved by Senator(s) Ingram |
2017-02-28 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2017-02-24 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Ingram for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2017-02-24 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onHealth and Welfare |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |