VT S0044 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to equally shared candidate campaign expenditures

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to equally shared candidate campaign expenditures

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-21HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations
2017-03-16SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2017-03-16SenatePending third reading, bill amended as moved by Senator(s) Flory
2017-03-16SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2017-03-15Senate3rd reading ordered
2017-03-15SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations, as amended, agreed to
2017-03-15SenateRecommendation of amendment agreed to
2017-03-15SenateRecommendation of amendment by Senator(s) Pearson, Ayer, Clarkson, Collamore, and White, text
2017-03-15SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Pearson for Committee on Government Operations
2017-03-15SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
2017-03-15SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2017-03-14SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onGovernment Operations
2017-01-24SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback