VT S0043 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 30, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 30, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to limiting prior authorization requirements for medication-assisted treatment
Title
An act relating to limiting prior authorization requirements for medication-assisted treatment
Sponsors
Sen. Virginia Lyons [D] | Sen. Ann Cummings [D] | Sen. Deborah Ingram [D] | Sen. Richard McCormack [D] |
Sen. Richard Westman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | House | Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 30, 2019 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 30, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on May 24, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2019-05-08 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2019-05-08 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2019-05-08 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-07 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-06 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-03 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2019-05-02 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-01 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-05-01 | House | Report of Committee on Human Services as amended agreed to |
2019-05-01 | House | Report of Committee on Human Services amended as offered by Committee on Health Care |
2019-05-01 | House | Rep. Cina of Burlington reported for the committee on Health Care |
2019-05-01 | House | Rep. Nicoll of Ludlow reported for the committee on Human Services |
2019-05-01 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-04-10 | House | Rep. Nicoll of Ludlow moved that the bill be committed to the committee on Health Care which was agreed to. |
2019-03-01 | House | Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg moved that the committee on Health Care be relieved of the bill and that the same be committed to the committee on Human Services which was agreed to. |
2019-02-22 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Health Care |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2019-02-20 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-02-19 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Ingram for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-02-19 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |