VT S0039 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor may 1, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to the repeal of the crime of obtaining maps and plans while at war

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to the repeal of the crime of obtaining maps and plans while at war

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-03HouseSenate Message, Signed by Governor may 1, 2017
2017-05-01SenateSigned by Governor on May 1, 2017
2017-04-25SenateDelivered to Governor on April 25, 2017
2017-04-11SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2017-04-11SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence
2017-04-07HouseRead Third time and Passed in Concurrence
2017-04-06HouseThird Reading Ordered
2017-04-06HouseRep. Tate of Mendon reported for the committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs
2017-04-06HouseRead Second Time
2017-03-17HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs
2017-03-15SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2017-03-15SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2017-03-14SenateReported favorably by Senator Benning for Committee on Judiciary, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
2017-03-14SenateFavorable report by Committee on Judiciary
2017-03-14SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2017-03-03SenateFavorable report by Committee on Judiciary
2017-01-20SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback