VT S0038 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Signed by Governor on March 29, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to the Government Accountability Committee and the State Outcomes Report

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to the Government Accountability Committee and the State Outcomes Report

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-29SenateSigned by Governor on March 29, 2017
2017-03-24SenateDelivered to Governor on March 24, 2017
2017-03-16SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2017-03-16SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence
2017-03-15HouseRead Third time and Passed in Concurrence
2017-03-14HouseThird Reading Ordered
2017-03-14HouseRep. Brumsted of Shelburne recommended for the committee on Government Operations
2017-03-14HouseRead Second Time
2017-02-17HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations
2017-02-15SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2017-02-15SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2017-02-14SenateReported favorably by Senator Collamore for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
2017-02-14SenateFavorable report by Committee on Government Operations
2017-02-14SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2017-02-10SenateFavorable report by Committee on Government Operations
2017-01-19SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback