VT S0034 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Signed by Governor on 6/12/17
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to rural economic development

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to rural economic development

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12SenateSigned by Governor on 6/12/17
2017-06-06SenateDelivered to Governor on 6/6/17
2017-05-11SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2017-05-11SenateCommittee of Conference report adopted
2017-05-11SenateCommittee of Conference report submitted by Senator Pollina for Committee, text
2017-05-11SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Pollina
2017-05-11SenateHouse message House adopted Conference Committee report
2017-05-11HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
2017-05-11HouseCommittee of Conference report adopted (Senate bill)
2017-05-11HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
2017-05-04SenateHouse message House appointed Conference Committee members
2017-05-04HouseSpeaker appointed Lawrence of Lyndon, Carr of Brandon and Sullivan of Dorset as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House
2017-05-04SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza
2017-05-04SenateCommittee of Conference appointed: Senators Pollina, Collamore, and Starr
2017-05-04SenateHouse proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator Starr
2017-05-04SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2017-05-04SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Starr
2017-05-04SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2017-05-04HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
2017-05-04HousePassed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2017-05-04HouseRead Third time
2017-05-03HouseThird Reading Ordered
2017-05-03HouseReport of Committee on Commerce and Economic Development as amended agreed to
2017-05-03HouseWhich was agreed to
2017-05-03HouseRep. Stuart of Brattleboro moved to amend the report of the committee on Commerce and Economic Development
2017-05-03HouseReport of the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development amended as recommended by the Committee on Appropriations
2017-05-03HouseRep. Keenan of St. Albans City recommended for the committee on Appropriations
2017-05-03HouseRep. Lucke of Hartford recommended for the committee on Ways and Means
2017-05-03HouseRep. Stuart of Brattleboro reported for the committee on Commerce and Economic Development
2017-05-03HouseRead Second Time
2017-05-01HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
2017-04-26HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
2017-04-05HouseRep. Townsend of South Burlington moved that the committee on Government Operations be relieved of the bill and that the same be committed to the committee on Commerce and Economic Development which was agreed to.
2017-04-04HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations
2017-03-30SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2017-03-30SenatePending third reading, motion to amend bill agreed to
2017-03-30SenatePending third reading, motion to amend bill offered by Senator(s) Ashe, Branagan, Brooks, Campion, Collamore, Cummings, Degree, Lyons, MacDonald, Pollina, Rodgers, Sirotkin, and Starr
2017-03-30SenateRecommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Ashe, Branagan, Brooks, Campion, Collamore, Cummings, Degree, Lyons, MacDonald, Pollina, Rodgers, Sirotkin, and Starr
2017-03-30SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2017-03-29Senate3rd reading ordered
2017-03-29SenateRecommendation of amendment disagreed to
2017-03-29SenateRecommendation of amendment by Senator(s) Bray, text
2017-03-29SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture, as amended, agreed to
2017-03-29SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations
2017-03-29SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture amended as recommended by Committee on Finance
2017-03-29SenateReported favorably by Senator Starr for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment
2017-03-29SenateReported favorably by Senator Lyons for Committee on Finance with recommendation of amendment
2017-03-29SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Pollina for Committee on Agriculture
2017-03-29SenateRecommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Bray
2017-03-29SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2017-03-29SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
2017-03-29SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture
2017-03-29SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2017-03-28SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onAppropriations
2017-03-28SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onFinance
2017-03-28SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onAgriculture
2017-03-24SenateReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
2017-03-24SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onFinance
2017-03-24SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onAgriculture
2017-03-21SenateReferred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31
2017-03-21SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onAgriculture
2017-02-15SenateCommittee on Government Operations relieved; bill committed to Committee on Agriculture on motion of Senator White
2017-01-18SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback