VT S0033 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to project-based tax increment financing districts
Title
An act relating to project-based tax increment financing districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-05-09 | Senate | House message: House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2022-05-09 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-05-06 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2022-05-06 | House | Read Third time and passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2022-05-06 | House | Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2022-05-06 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2022-05-06 | House | Report of Committee on Commerce and Economic Development as amended agreed to |
2022-05-06 | House | Report of the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development amended as recommended by the Committee on Ways and Means |
2022-05-06 | House | Rep. Kornheiser of Brattleboro recommended for the Committee on Ways and Means |
2022-05-06 | House | Rep. Kimbell of Woodstock reported for the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development |
2022-05-06 | House | Read Second time |
2022-05-06 | House | Rules suspended and taken up for immediate consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2022-05-06 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2021-04-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2021-03-30 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2021-03-25 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs, as amended, agreed to |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs amended as recommended by Committee on Finance |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Cummings for Committee on Finance with recommendation of amendment |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Ram for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2021-03-24 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |