VT S0032 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the public financing of campaigns
Title
An act relating to the public financing of campaigns
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-03-26 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Starr for Committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Pollina for Committee on Government Operations |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2019-03-22 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |