VT S0027 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to maintaining the home health agency provider tax

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to maintaining the home health agency provider tax

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-25SenateUnfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2020-09-24SenateNew Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2020-09-23SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2020-09-23SenateHouse Proposal of Amendment
2020-09-23SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-09-22HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2020-09-22HouseRead Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
2020-09-22HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Sibilia of Dover, Gannon of Wilmington, James of Manchester, and Pajala of Londonderry agreed to
2020-09-18HouseThird Reading Ordered
2020-09-18HouseReport of Committee on Ways and Means agreed to.
2020-09-18HouseRep. Till of Jericho recommended for the committee on Ways and Means
2020-09-18HouseRead Second Time
2019-02-28HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means
2019-02-26SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2019-02-26SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2019-02-22Senate3rd reading ordered
2019-02-22SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to
2019-02-22SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Cummings for Committee on Finance
2019-02-22SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
2019-02-22SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2019-02-21SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
2019-02-21SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-01-17SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback