VT S0023 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs
Pending: House General, Housing and Military Affairs Committee
Hearing: Mar 26 House Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to increasing the minimum wage

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to increasing the minimum wage

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs
2019-02-26SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2019-02-26SenateMotion agreed to
2019-02-26SenatePending third reading, motion to amend bill offered by Senator(s) Sirotkin and Nitka
2019-02-26SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2019-02-22SenateSenator Benning explained vote
2019-02-22Senate3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Benning, Passed -- Needed 14 of 27 to Pass -- Yeas = 19, Nays = 8
2019-02-22SenateRecommendation of amendment, as amended, agreed to on roll call requested by Senator Brock, Passed -- Needed 14 of 27 to Pass -- Yeas = 19, Nays = 8
2019-02-22SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-22SenateReported favorably by Senator McCormack for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment
2019-02-22SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Sirotkin for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2019-02-22SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-22SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2019-02-22SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2019-02-21SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-21SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2019-02-21SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-02-14SenateReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
2019-02-14SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2019-02-14SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-01-16SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback