VT S0020 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Division of the Senate Yeas 19, Nays 9
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to permanent licenses for persons 66 years of age or older

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to permanent licenses for persons 66 years of age or older

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-27SenateDivision of the Senate Yeas 19, Nays 9
2017-04-27SenateCommitted to the Committee on Natural Resources and Energy on motion of Senator Bray
2017-04-27SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2017-04-27SenateNew Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2017-04-26SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2017-04-26SenateHouse Proposal of Amendment
2017-04-21HouseRead Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
2017-04-20HouseThird Reading Ordered
2017-04-20HouseReport of Committee on Natural Resources, Fish & Wildlife agreed to.
2017-04-20HouseRep. Helm of Fair Haven recommended for the committee on Appropriations
2017-04-20HouseRep. Canfield of Fair Haven recommended for the committee on Ways and Means
2017-04-20HouseRep. Beyor of Highgate reported for the committee on Natural Resources, Fish & Wildlife
2017-04-20HouseRead Second Time
2017-04-18HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
2017-04-12HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
2017-03-21HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, Fish & Wildlife
2017-03-16SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2017-03-16SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2017-03-15Senate3rd reading ordered
2017-03-15SenateReported favorably by Senator Degree for Committee on Finance
2017-03-15SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Rodgers for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2017-03-15SenateFavorable report by Committee on Finance
2017-03-15SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2017-03-15SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2017-03-14SenateFavorable report by Committee on Finance
2017-03-14SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onNatural Resources and Energy
2017-03-01SenateReferred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31
2017-03-01SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onNatural Resources and Energy
2017-01-12SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback