VT S0019 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-21 - Signed by Governor on February 20, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to allowing silver-level nonqualified health benefit plans to be offered outside the Vermont Health Benefit Exchange

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to allowing silver-level nonqualified health benefit plans to be offered outside the Vermont Health Benefit Exchange

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-21SenateSigned by Governor on February 20, 2018
2018-02-01SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2018-02-01SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence
2018-01-31HousePassed in concurrence
2018-01-31HouseRead Third time
2018-01-30HouseThird Reading Ordered
2018-01-30HouseRep. Briglin of Thetford reported for the committee on Health Care
2018-01-30HouseRead Second Time
2018-01-24HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Health Care
2018-01-19SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2018-01-18Senate3rd reading ordered
2018-01-19SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2018-01-18SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to
2018-01-18SenateReported favorably by Senator Cummings for Committee on Finance
2018-01-18SenateReported favorably by Senator Cummings for Committee on Health and Welfare with recommendation of amendment
2018-01-18SenateFavorable report by Committee on Finance
2018-01-18SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
2018-01-18SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2018-01-17SenateFavorable report by Committee on Finance
2018-01-17SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onHealth and Welfare
2018-01-17SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-01-12SenateRules suspended & bill committed to Committee on Finance with the report of Committee on Health and Welfare intact, on motion of Senator Ingram
2018-01-10SenateCommittee on Finance relieved; bill committed to Committee on Health and Welfare on motion of Senator Cummings
2017-02-14SenateCommittee on Health and Welfare relieved; bill committed to Committee on Finance on motion of Senator Ayer
2017-01-12SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback