VT S0018 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Rep. Sharpe of Bristol moved that the committee on Education be relieved of the bill and that the same be committed to the committee on Judiciary which was agreed to.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to freedom of expression for students

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to freedom of expression for students

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-11HouseRep. Sharpe of Bristol moved that the committee on Education be relieved of the bill and that the same be committed to the committee on Judiciary which was agreed to.
2017-02-16HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Education
2017-02-14SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2017-02-14SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2017-02-10Senate3rd reading ordered
2017-02-10SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Education, as amended, agreed to
2017-02-10SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Education amended as moved by Senator Benning
2017-02-10SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Benning for Committee on Education
2017-02-10SenateRecommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Benning
2017-02-10SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education
2017-02-10SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2017-02-09SenateRecommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator Benning
2017-02-09SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education
2017-02-09SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2017-02-08SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education
2017-02-08SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2017-02-07SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onEducation
2017-01-12SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Education

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback