VT S0017 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-02 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs
Pending: House General, Housing and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to the qualifications of candidates for Adjutant and Inspector General

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to the qualifications of candidates for Adjutant and Inspector General

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-02HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs
2017-01-31SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2017-01-31SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2017-01-27SenateReported favorably by Senator Collamore for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
2017-01-27SenateFavorable report by Committee on Government Operations
2017-01-27SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2017-01-26SenateFavorable report by Committee on Government Operations
2017-01-26SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2017-01-25SenateFavorable report by Committee on Government Operations
2017-01-25SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2017-01-24SenateFavorable report by Committee on Government Operations
2017-01-12SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback