VT S0017 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-02 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs
Pending: House General, Housing and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-02 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs
Pending: House General, Housing and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the qualifications of candidates for Adjutant and Inspector General
Title
An act relating to the qualifications of candidates for Adjutant and Inspector General
Sponsors
Sen. Jeanette White [D] | Sen. Rebecca Balint [D] | Sen. Joseph Benning [R] | Sen. Alison Clarkson [D] |
Sen. Brian Collamore [R] | Sen. Jane Kitchel [D] | Sen. Richard Mazza [D] | Sen. Anthony Pollina [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-02 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2017-01-31 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Collamore for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2017-01-25 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |