VT S0017 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-07 - Signed by Governor on June 2, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating To Registering Four Nonprofit Organizations To Dispense Marijuana For Symptom Relief

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Relating To Registering Four Nonprofit Organizations To Dispense Marijuana For Symptom Relief

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Signed by Governor on June 2, 2011
2011-05-06 Delivered to Governor on May 26, 2011
2011-05-06 As passed by Senate and House
2011-05-06 Rules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell
2011-05-06 House proposal of amendment concurred in
2011-05-06 Motion disagreed to
2011-05-06 Motion by Senator Galbraith that Senate concur in House Proposal of Amendment with further proposal of amendment
2011-05-06 House proposal of amendment; text
2011-05-06 Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell
2011-05-06 House Proposal of Amendment
2011-05-05 House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2011-05-05 Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
2011-05-05 Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 143 to Pass -- Yeas = 99, Nays = 44
2011-05-05 Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
2011-05-05 Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 72 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 41, Nays = 101
2011-05-05 Rep. Browning of Arlington moved to commit the bill to the Committee on Judiciary which was disagreed to
2011-05-05 Rep. Donaghy of Poultney demanded yeas and nays
2011-05-05 Read Third time
2011-05-04 Third Reading Ordered
2011-05-04 Report of Committee on Human Services as amended agreed to
2011-05-04 Proposal of Amendment of the Committee on Human Services agreed to
2011-05-04 Rep. Donaghy of Poultney asked leave to withdraw motion
2011-05-04 Rep. Donaghy of Poultney demanded yeas and nays
2011-05-04 Amendment as offered by Rep. Haas of Rochester agreed to
2011-05-04 Rep. Kilmartin of Newport City raised a Point of Order
2011-05-04 Rep. Savage of Swanton raised a Point of Order
2011-05-04 Rep. Haas of Rochester moved to amend the recommendation of amendment offered by Human Services
2011-05-04 Recommendation of Amendment of the Committee on Appropriations agreed to
2011-05-04 Recommendation of Amendment of the Committee on Ways and Means agreed to
2011-05-04 Rep. O'Brien of Richmond, recommended for the committee on Appropriations
2011-05-03 Rep. Rep. Wilson of Manchester, recommended for the committee on Ways and Means
2011-05-03 Rep. Rep. Haas of Rochester reported for the committee on Human Services
2011-05-04 Read Second Time
2011-04-29 Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
2011-04-27 Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
2011-04-20 Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Human Services
2011-04-15 Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell
2011-04-15 Read 3rd time & passed
2011-04-15 New Business/Third Reading
2011-04-14 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Nitka, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 25, Nays = 4
2011-04-14 Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations, as amended, agreed to
2011-04-14 Recommendation of amendment agreed to on roll call, requested by Senator Mullin, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 24, Nays = 5
2011-04-14 Recommendation of amendment by Senator(s) Mullin, text
2011-04-14 Recommendation of amendment agreed to
2011-04-14 Senator White, on behalf of Committee on Government Operations, moved to amend bill; text
2011-04-14 Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations
2011-04-14 Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations amended as recommended by Committee on Finance
2011-04-14 Reported favorably by Senator Sears for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment
2011-04-14 Reported favorably by Senator Cummings for Committee on Finance with recommendation of amendment
2011-04-14 Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator White for Committee on Government Operations
2011-04-14 Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) White on behalf of the Committee on Government Operations
2011-04-14 Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2011-04-14 Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
2011-04-14 Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
2011-04-14 Unfinished Business/Second Reading
2011-04-13 Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) White on behalf of the Committee on Government Operations
2011-04-13 Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2011-04-13 Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
2011-04-13 Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
2011-04-13 Unfinished Business/Second Reading
2011-04-12 New Business/Second Reading
2011-04-08 Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) White on behalf of the Committe on Government Operations
2011-04-08 Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onAppropriations
2011-04-08 Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onFinance
2011-04-08 Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onGovernment Operations
2011-04-08 Entered on Notice Calendar
2011-04-07 Rules suspended & bill committed to Committee on Rules with the report of Committee on Government Operations , Finance & Appropriations intact
2011-04-07 Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Carris
2011-04-07 Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onFinance
2011-04-07 Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onGovernment Operations
2011-04-07 Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onAppropriations
2011-04-07 Entered on Notice Calendar
2011-04-05 Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
2011-04-05 Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onFinance
2011-04-05 Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onGovernment Operations
2011-04-05 Entered on Notice Calendar
2011-03-15 Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31
2011-03-15 Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onGovernment Operations
2011-03-15 Entered on Notice Calendar
2011-01-28 Committee on Health and Welfare relieved; bill committed to Committee on Government Operations on motion of Senator Ayer
2011-01-14 Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback