VT S0009 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-04 - Senate Message, signed by Governor February 3, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to extending certain workers’ compensation amendments related to COVID-19

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to extending certain workers’ compensation amendments related to COVID-19

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-04HouseSenate Message, signed by Governor February 3, 2021
2021-02-04SenateSigned by Governor on February 3, 2021
2021-01-28SenateDelivered to Governor on January 28, 2021
2021-01-22HouseSenate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in
2021-01-22SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2021-01-22SenateRules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint
2021-01-22SenateHouse proposal of amendment concurred in
2021-01-22SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2021-01-22SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Balint
2021-01-22SenateHouse Proposal of Amendment
2021-01-22SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2021-01-21SenateHouse message: House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2021-01-21HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2021-01-21HouseRead Third time and passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2021-01-21HouseRules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2021-01-21HouseThird Reading ordered
2021-01-21HouseRep. Kitzmiller of Montpelier moved that the House propose to the Senate to amend the bill which was agreed to
2021-01-21HouseRep. Kitzmiller of Montpelier reported for the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development
2021-01-21HouseRead Second time
2021-01-19HouseRead First Time and referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development
2021-01-15SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint
2021-01-15SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2021-01-15SenateRules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Balint
2021-01-15Senate3rd reading ordered
2021-01-15SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs agreed to
2021-01-15SenateReported favorably by Senator Sirotkin for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs with recommendation of amendment
2021-01-15SenateRead 2nd time
2021-01-15SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2021-01-15SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2021-01-14SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2021-01-14SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2021-01-12SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback