VT S0009 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Signed by Governor on May 30, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Signed by Governor on May 30, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the preparation of poultry products
Title
An act relating to the preparation of poultry products
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 30, 2017 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 5/30/17 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on 5/24/17 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza |
2017-05-10 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Committee of Conference report adopted |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Starr for Committee, text |
2017-05-10 | Senate | New Business/Committee of Conference Report |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Committee of Conference Report |
2017-05-05 | Senate | House message House adopted Conference Committee report |
2017-05-05 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2017-05-05 | House | Committee of Conference report adopted (Senate bill) |
2017-05-05 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Starr, Brooks, and Branagan |
2017-05-04 | Senate | House message House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed |
2017-05-04 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2017-05-04 | House | Speaker appointed Buckholz of Hartford, Bartholomew of Hartland and Norris of Shoreham as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2017-05-04 | House | Which was agreed to |
2017-05-04 | House | Rep. Buckholz of Hartford moved the House refuse to concur and asked for a committee of conference |
2017-05-04 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment considered |
2017-05-02 | House | Senate message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Brooks and Starr; text |
2017-05-02 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2017-05-01 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2017-04-28 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2017-04-28 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2017-04-27 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2017-04-27 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2017-04-27 | House | Rep. Buckholz of Hartford moved to amend the House proposal of amendment which was agreed to |
2017-04-26 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2017-04-26 | House | Report of Committee on Agriculture & Forestry agreed to. |
2017-04-26 | House | Rep. Buckholz of Hartford reported for the committee on Agriculture & Forestry |
2017-04-26 | House | Read Second Time |
2017-03-14 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Agriculture & Forestry |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2017-03-02 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2017-03-01 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture agreed to |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Brooks for Committee on Agriculture |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture |
2017-03-01 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onAgriculture |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Agriculture |