VT S0008 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Signed by Governor on June 14, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to establishing the State Ethics Commission and standards of governmental ethical conduct

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to establishing the State Ethics Commission and standards of governmental ethical conduct

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-10 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 120, Nays = 24 (Y: 120 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 145 to Pass -- Yeas = 144, Nays = 1 (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 72 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 33, Nays = 109 (Y: 33 N: 109 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-14SenateSigned by Governor on June 14, 2017
2017-06-14SenateSigned by Governor on 6/14/17
2017-06-09SenateDelivered to Governor on 6/9/17
2017-05-11SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2017-05-11SenateHouse message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment
2017-05-10HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 120, Nays = 24
2017-05-10HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment to the House Proposal of Amendment agreed to
2017-05-10HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
2017-05-10HouseSenate message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto
2017-05-10SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza
2017-05-10SenateProposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment agreed to
2017-05-10SenateProposal of amendment by Senator(s) White; text
2017-05-10SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2017-05-10SenateProposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) White
2017-05-10SenateUnfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2017-05-08SenateProposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) White
2017-05-08SenateNew Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2017-05-05SenateHouse Proposal of Amendment
2017-05-04SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2017-05-02HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 145 to Pass -- Yeas = 144, Nays = 1
2017-05-02HousePassed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2017-05-02HouseRead Third time
2017-05-02HouseWhich was agreed to
2017-05-02HouseRep. Lippert of Hinesburg moved to amend the House proposal of amendment.
2017-05-02HouseWhich was agreed to
2017-05-02HouseRep. Donahue of Northfield moved to amend the House proposal of amendment.
2017-05-02HouseWhich was agreed to
2017-05-02HouseRep. Townsend of South Burlington moved to amend the House proposal of amendment.
2017-05-02HouseWhich was agreed to
2017-05-02HouseRep. Yantachka of Charlotte moved to amend the House proposal of amendment.
2017-05-02HouseRoll Call Results Failed -- Needed 72 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 33, Nays = 109
2017-05-02HouseWhich was disagreed to
2017-05-02HouseRep. Poirier of Barre City moved to amend the House proposal of amendment.
2017-05-01HouseThird Reading Ordered
2017-05-01HouseReport of Committee on Government Operations as amended agreed to
2017-05-01HouseRep. Deen of Westminster moved to amend the report of the committee on Government Operations, which was agreed to.
2017-05-01HouseRep. Townsend of South Burlington moved to amend the report of the committee on Government Operations, which was agreed to.
2017-05-01HouseRep. Feltus of Lyndon recommended for the committee on Appropriations
2017-05-01HouseRep. Townsend of South Burlington reported for the committee on Government Operations
2017-05-01HouseRead Second Time
2017-04-26HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
2017-02-14HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations
2017-02-09SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2017-02-09SenateProposal of amendment agreed to
2017-02-09SenatePending third reading, Senator(s) Benning, Ayer, Clarkson, Collamore, Pearson, and White moved to amend bill
2017-02-09SenateRecommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Benning, Ayer, Clarkson, Collamore, Pearson, Pollina, and White
2017-02-09SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2017-02-08SenatePending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Benning, Ayer, Collamore, Clarkson, Pearson, and White
2017-02-08SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2017-02-07Senate3rd reading ordered
2017-02-07SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations, as amended, agreed to
2017-02-07SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations
2017-02-07SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations amended as moved by Senator Sears
2017-02-07SenateRecommendation of amendment by Senator(s) Sears, text
2017-02-07SenateReported favorably by Senator Sears for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment
2017-02-07SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator White for Committee on Government Operations
2017-02-07SenateRecommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator Sears to Recommendation of Amendment of the Committee on Appropriations
2017-02-07SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2017-02-07SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
2017-02-07SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2017-02-03SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onAppropriations
2017-02-03SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onGovernment Operations
2017-01-27SenateReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
2017-01-27SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onGovernment Operations
2017-01-10SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback