VT S0003 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Signed by Governor on May 30, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to mental health professionals’ duty to warn

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to mental health professionals’ duty to warn

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-30SenateSigned by Governor on May 30, 2017
2017-05-30SenateSigned by Governor on 5/30/17
2017-05-24SenateDelivered to Governor on 5/24/17
2017-05-04SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2017-05-04SenateHouse proposal of amendment concurred in on roll call requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 24, Nays = 4
2017-05-04SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2017-05-04SenateUnfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2017-05-03SenateUnfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2017-05-02SenateNew Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2017-05-01SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2017-05-01SenateHouse Proposal of Amendment
2017-04-28HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
2017-04-28HouseRead Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
2017-04-27HouseThird Reading Ordered
2017-04-27HouseReport of Committee on Judiciary agreed to.
2017-04-27HouseRep. Conquest of Newbury reported for the committee on Judiciary
2017-04-27HouseRead Second Time
2017-04-27HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
2017-04-12HouseRep. Lippert of Hinesburg moved that the committee on Health Care be relieved of the bill and that the same be committed to the committee on Judiciary which was agreed to.
2017-03-02HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Health Care
2017-02-28SenateRead 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 14 of 26 to Pass -- Yeas = 26, Nays = 0
2017-02-28SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2017-02-24Senate3rd reading ordered
2017-02-24SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to
2017-02-24SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator White for Committee on Judiciary
2017-02-24SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2017-02-24SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2017-02-23SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary
2017-01-10SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback