VT S0003 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Signed by Governor on May 30, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Signed by Governor on May 30, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to mental health professionals’ duty to warn
Title
An act relating to mental health professionals’ duty to warn
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Senate - House proposal of amendment concurred in on roll call requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 24, Nays = 4 (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 14 of 26 to Pass -- Yeas = 26, Nays = 0 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 14 of 26 to Pass -- Yeas = 26, Nays = 0 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 30, 2017 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 5/30/17 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on 5/24/17 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2017-05-04 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in on roll call requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 24, Nays = 4 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2017-05-02 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2017-05-01 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2017-05-01 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2017-04-28 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2017-04-28 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2017-04-27 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2017-04-27 | House | Report of Committee on Judiciary agreed to. |
2017-04-27 | House | Rep. Conquest of Newbury reported for the committee on Judiciary |
2017-04-27 | House | Read Second Time |
2017-04-27 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton |
2017-04-12 | House | Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg moved that the committee on Health Care be relieved of the bill and that the same be committed to the committee on Judiciary which was agreed to. |
2017-03-02 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Health Care |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 14 of 26 to Pass -- Yeas = 26, Nays = 0 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2017-02-24 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator White for Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-24 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |