VT S0002 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Signed by Governor on February 23, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to information sharing by the Commissioner of Financial Regulation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to information sharing by the Commissioner of Financial Regulation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-23SenateSigned by Governor on February 23, 2017
2017-02-21SenateDelivered to Governor on February 21, 2017
2017-02-08SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2017-02-08SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence
2017-02-07HouseRead Third time and Passed in Concurrence
2017-02-03HouseThird Reading Ordered
2017-02-03HouseRep. Myers of Essex recommended for the committee on Commerce and Economic Development
2017-02-03HouseRead Second Time
2017-01-26HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development
2017-01-24SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2017-01-24SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2017-01-20SenateReported favorably by Senator Lyons for Committee on Finance, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
2017-01-20SenateFavorable report by Committee on Finance
2017-01-20SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2017-01-19SenateFavorable report by Committee on Finance
2017-01-10SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback